Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Padilla Cardona

Bishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1945 BornLeón
10 Jun 197328.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 199246.8AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
17 Mar 199246.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de León, Oaxaca, México
26 Aug 199651.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
25 Nov 200055.6SucceededBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
1 Oct 200964.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
4 Nov 200964.5InstalledBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Felipe Padilla Cardona:
Bishop Felipe Padilla Cardona (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Obregón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Obregón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013