Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Efrén Ramos Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1939Born
15 Aug 196424.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 199051.0AppointedBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México
18 Dec 199051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México
19 Feb 200565.3DiedBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Efrén Ramos Salazar
Bishop Efrén Ramos Salazar (born , died ) Bishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTlatlauquitepec

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,597
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast