Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa)

Archidioecesis Ialapensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hipólito Reyes Larios, Archbishop
  • Sergio Obeso Rivera, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 9 June 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Veracruz
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 6,137 (2,370 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Golfo
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdexalapa.com/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 359, Av. Manuel Avila Camacho 73, 91000 Xalapa, Ver., México
  • Telephone: (228)812-05-79
  • Fax: 817-55-78

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
19 March 1863ErectedDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Diocese of Tlaxcala
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa (erected)
24 November 1922Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Diocese of Papantla (erected)
Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
29 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
23 May 1959Territory LostDiocese of Tehuantepec
Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla (erected)
Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa)
9 June 1962ErectedDiocese of San Andrés Tuxtla Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa) (erected)
Diocese of Veracruz (erected)
15 April 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa) Diocese of Córdoba (erected)
15 April 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa) Diocese of Orizaba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
19501,040,0001,100,00094.5%160141745,9771434076ap1951
Archdiocese of Veracruz-Jalapa
Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa)
1965900,000940,00095.7%153241775,0844446582ap1967
19681,134,0001,254,00090.4%163161796,3353245071ap1971
19761,283,7341,324,80096.9%16381717,5071745395ap1977
19801,228,0751,420,00086.5%18081886,53217505108ap1981
19902,039,8812,310,64088.3%212112239,14723467125ap1991
19991,942,5022,201,61288.2%248112597,50017470129ap2000
2000908,292978,14492.9%146111575,7851921553ap2001
20011,022,1431,278,14480.0%13141357,571629656ap2002
20021,009,1281,081,68593.3%13051357,475930161ap2003
2003989,2101,073,14892.2%132101426,9661434665ap2004
2004995,4981,062,66493.7%137111486,7262134068ap2005
20061,105,0001,156,00095.6%13591447,6731929071ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013