Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sofron Dmyterko, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1917BornBychkivci
Sep 193720.3ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 May 194225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Nov 196851.5Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199173.6ConfirmedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 Nov 199780.4RetiredBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Nov 200891.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Sofron Dmyterko:
Bishop Sofron Dmyterko O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,259
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 May 2014