Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Guízar y Valencia

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua, México

Titular Archbishop of Febiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1879Born
7 Mar 190323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
30 Jul 192040.5AppointedBishop of Chihuahua, México
30 Jan 192141.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chihuahua, México
4 Feb 192141.1InstalledBishop of Chihuahua, México
18 Dec 195878.9AppointedArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
24 Aug 196989.6RetiredArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
24 Aug 196989.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Febiana
4 Aug 197191.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guízar y Valencia
Archbishop Antonio Guízar y Valencia (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotija

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 50.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 7
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 375, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast