Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Raphael Guizar Valencia

Deceased

Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1878BornCotija
1 Jun 190123.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 191941.3AppointedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
30 Nov 191941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
4 Jan 192041.7InstalledBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
6 Jun 193860.1DiedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
29 Jan 1995Beatified
15 Oct 2006Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Raphael Guizar Valencia:
Bishop St. Raphael Guizar Valencia (born , died ) Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • cano: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013