Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Talamás Camandari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1917Born
16 May 194325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chihuahua, México
21 May 195739.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
8 Sep 195740.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
11 Jul 199275.0RetiredBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
10 May 200587.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Talamás Camandari
Bishop Manuel Talamás Camandari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Juárez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChihuahua

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast