Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Uranga y Sáenz

Deceased

Bishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1863BornSanta Cruz de Rosales
5 Mar 188622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
25 Jun 190339.6AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
16 Aug 190339.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sinaloa, México
4 Oct 190339.9InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
18 Dec 191956.1ResignedBishop of Sinaloa, México
18 Dec 191956.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Dec 191956.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
21 Apr 192258.4AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
8 Jun 192258.6InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
8 Jul 193066.6DiedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Uranga y Sáenz:
Bishop Francisco Uranga y Sáenz (born , died ) Bishop of Cuernavaca

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: JPG
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 519
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013