Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Espino Porras

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chihuahua

Titular Bishop of Pharbaethus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1907BornChihuahua
7 Jul 192921.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chihuahua, México
27 Feb 194335.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chihuahua, México
27 Feb 194335.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
13 Jun 194335.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
5 May 196153.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Chihuahua, México
25 Jun 198678.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Espino Porras:
Bishop Francisco Espino Porras (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chihuahua

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013