Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco María González y Arias

Deceased

Bishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1874BornCotija
4 Apr 189722.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 192247.7AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
11 Jun 192247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
22 Aug 192248.0InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
30 Jan 193156.5AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
6 May 193156.7InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
20 Aug 194672.0DiedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco María González y Arias:
Bishop Francisco María González y Arias (born , died ) Bishop of Cuernavaca

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013