Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Fulcheri y Pietrasanta

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán


from the Diocese of Cuernavaca Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1874BornSan Angel
17 Dec 189824.6Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
6 May 191238.0AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
8 Sep 191238.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
19 Dec 191238.6InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
21 Apr 192247.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
25 Jun 192248.1InstalledBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
30 Jun 194672.1DiedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Manuel Fulcheri y Pietrasanta:
Bishop Manuel Fulcheri y Pietrasanta (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013