Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adalberto Almeida y Merino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1916Born
24 Apr 194326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chihuahua, México
28 May 195639.9AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
15 Aug 195640.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
14 Apr 196245.8AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
24 Aug 196953.2AppointedArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
8 Sep 196953.2InstalledArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
24 Jun 199175.0RetiredArchbishop of Chihuahua, México
21 Jun 200892.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Almeida y Merino
Archbishop Adalberto Almeida y Merino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chihuahua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChihuahua

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 69
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018