Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

Archidioecesis Fomtienensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Siao-Nan-Kuen, Shenyang, Liaoning, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}
16 August 1838ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}
10 May 1898SplitVicariate Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Manchuria {Manciuria Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Moukden
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Moukden
Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Moukden Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
195011,7675,040,154.2%333335614127ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 20 Apr 2013