Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simone Gritti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1687³BornZadar
15 Mar 171023.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 171629.2AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
19 Apr 171629.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
8 Jun 171831.4AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
23 Dec 172942.9AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
25 Nov 174356.8ResignedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
2 Dec 174356.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
16 Sep 176174.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Gritti:
Archbishop Simone Gritti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015