Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Lieto

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1711BornNapoli
26 Mar 173523.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 175442.6SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
20 May 175442.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
23 May 175442.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
5 Feb 176957.5DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Lieto:
Archbishop Giacomo Lieto (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015