Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Andrea Cavalcanti, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1698BornCaccuri
1714¹15.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
5 Oct 172122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Mar 175556.4SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
12 May 175556.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
18 May 175556.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
3 Feb 176970.2DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Andrea Cavalcanti:
Archbishop Domenico Andrea Cavalcanti C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 412
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015