Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano de Carli

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1699³Born
29 Sep 172727.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 175455.0AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
21 Dec 175455.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Feb 176161.2DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano de Carli (VIAF: 45948535)
Bishop Gaetano de Carli (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComacchio

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast