Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria Testa

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1704Born
22 Sep 173127.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 174843.9SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 May 174843.9ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
12 May 174844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
28 Mar 175449.8SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
22 Apr 175449.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
17 May 177369.0DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Testa
Archbishop Francesco Maria Testa (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicosia

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast