Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tripcovich

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1705³Born
18 Dec 172823.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 175449.1AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
28 Jul 175449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
26 Jul 177166.1DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tripcovich
Bishop Antonio Tripcovich (born , died ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotor

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast