Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Pacelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1715BornNapoli
20 Dec 173823.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 175237.0AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
30 Nov 175237.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
4 Oct 178064.9DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Pacelli:
Bishop Tommaso Pacelli (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015