Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Cicirelli

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1709³BornMorra
15 Feb 173323.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Feb 173323.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 175849.7AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
21 Dec 175849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
May 1790³81.1DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Cicirelli:
Bishop NicolÚ Cicirelli (born , died May 1790) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1785
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1758, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015