Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele di Tarsia, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1696BornConversano
21 Dec 172024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
24 Jan 175255.3AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
30 Jan 175255.3Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
7 May 177275.6DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele di Tarsia:
Bishop Michele di Tarsia C.P.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015