Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pettorelli Lalatta

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1712Born
31 Mar 173624.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 176048.5SelectedBishop of Parma, Italy
15 Dec 176048.8ConfirmedBishop of Parma, Italy
21 Dec 176048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
2 May 178876.2DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pettorelli Lalatta
Bishop Francesco Pettorelli Lalatta (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast