Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Tipaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1669³BornNapoli
20 Dec 169223.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 171748.2AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
20 Jun 171748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
20 Feb 174878.9DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Tipaldi:
Bishop Filippo Tipaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 99
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015