Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Rocco Gualtieri

Apostolic Nuncio to Madagascar

Titular Archbishop of Sagone

Apostolic Nuncio to Comoros

Apostolic Nuncio to Mauritius

Apostolic Nuncio to Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1961 Born
24 Sep 198827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
13 Apr 201554.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Madagascar
13 Apr 201554.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sagone
30 May 201554.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sagone
26 Sep 201554.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
24 Oct 201554.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritius
13 Nov 201554.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Comoros

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rocco Gualtieri
Archbishop Paolo Rocco Gualtieri (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Madagascar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSupersano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Madagascar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Apr 2015
  • c2: CB, 26 Apr 2015
  • c34: CB, 31 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,498
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast