Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Francis Crotty

Apostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso

Titular Archbishop of Lindisfarna

Apostolic Nuncio to Niger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1970 Born
3 Jul 199424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
1 Feb 202049.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
1 Feb 202049.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lindisfarna
25 Apr 202050.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
15 Aug 202050.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lindisfarna

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Crotty
Archbishop Michael Francis Crotty (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Burkina Faso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallow, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Colman, Pro-Cathedral, Cobh, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Colman, Pro-Cathedral, Cobh, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Burkina Faso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Feb 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2020
  • loc: CL, 25 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 17 Jul 2020
  • ~c2: CB, 18 Jul 2020
  • c2: CB, 8 Aug 2020
  • c34: CB, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Aug 2020

Quantcast