Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Columba Macbeth-Green, O.S.P.P.E.

Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1968 BornForbes
15 Sep 199628.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
22 Nov 199729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
12 Apr 201445.8AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
3 Jul 201446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
5 Jul 201446.0InstalledBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Columba Macbeth-Green:
Bishop Columba Macbeth-Green O.S.P.P.E. (born ) Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wilcannia-Forbes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2014
  • i: CB, 11 May 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jun 2014