Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubén Oscar Frassia

Bishop of Avellaneda-Lanús


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1945 BornBuenos Aires
24 Nov 197328.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 199246.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Feb 199246.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
4 Apr 199246.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
22 Jul 199347.6AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
15 Oct 199347.9InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
25 Nov 200055.0AppointedBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
3 Mar 200155.3InstalledBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rubén Oscar Frassia:
Bishop Rubén Oscar Frassia (born ) Bishop of Avellaneda-Lanús

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,769
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 5 Sep 2013