Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Elizalde, O.S.B.

Bishop of Nueve de Julio

Note/Previous Titular See: (San Benito de Buenos Aires-Lujan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1940 BornBuenos Aires
11 Feb 196120.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Jan 197130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jul 199958.7AppointedBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
14 Sep 199958.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
15 Sep 199958.9InstalledBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Martín de Elizalde:
Bishop Martín de Elizalde O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Nueve de Julio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nueve de Julio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,611

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013