Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Tomás Farrell

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Quilmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1930BornMorón
15 Aug 196029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
29 Mar 199766.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quilmes, Argentina
12 Apr 199766.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Quilmes, Argentina
19 May 200069.6DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Quilmes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Tomás Farrell:
Bishop Gerardo Tomás Farrell (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Quilmes

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,948
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013