Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis-Antoine-Luc de Frayssinous

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1765BornCurières, France
6 Jun 178924.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 182256.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
11 Jun 182257.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
12 Dec 184176.6DiedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior

MicroData Summary for Denis-Antoine-Luc de Frayssinous:
Bishop Denis-Antoine-Luc de Frayssinous (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013