Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph-François-Victor Monyer de Prilly

Deceased

Bishop of Châlons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1775BornAvignon
21 Sep 181135.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 182347.6SelectedBishop of Châlons, France
17 Nov 182348.1ConfirmedBishop of Châlons, France
18 Jan 182448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
1 Jan 186084.2DiedBishop of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph-François-Victor Monyer de Prilly:
Bishop Marie-Joseph-François-Victor Monyer de Prilly (born , died ) Bishop of Châlons

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013