Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Xavier de Neirac

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1757Born
1782²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 182365.3SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
16 May 182365.4ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
13 Jul 182365.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
28 Jan 183375.1DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Xavier de Neirac (VIAF: 198925653)
Bishop Antoine-Xavier de Neirac (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVabres

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast