Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Martin de Boisville

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1755Born
20 Mar 177924.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181762.6SelectedBishop of Blois, France
1 Oct 181762.7ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
30 Jan 182267.0SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
19 Apr 182267.2ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
11 Aug 182267.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
8 Sep 182267.6InstalledBishop of Dijon, France
27 May 182974.3DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Martin de Boisville
Bishop Jean-François Martin de Boisville (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113, and Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast