Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roch-Etienne de Vichy

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1753BornPaulhaguet
23 Dec 178027.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181764.2SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
1 Oct 181764.2ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
31 Jul 181966.1SelectedBishop of Autun, France
27 Sep 181966.2ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
28 Oct 181966.3Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
3 Apr 182975.7DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Roch-Etienne de Vichy:
Bishop Roch-Etienne de Vichy (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 60, and Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013