Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Raillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1762Born
24 Sep 178523.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 182966.9SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
28 Sep 182967.1ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
11 Nov 182967.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
10 Feb 183168.5SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
24 Feb 183269.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
20 Sep 183270.1InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
13 Feb 183572.5DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Raillon
Archbishop Jacques Raillon (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgoin

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast