Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Jean-Joseph Brulley de La Brunière

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1750BornSézanne
27 Mar 178434.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 182271.9SelectedBishop of Mende, France
19 Apr 182272.2ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
2 Jun 182272.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
16 Dec 184898.9DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Jean-Joseph Brulley de La Brunière:
Bishop Claude-Jean-Joseph Brulley de La Brunière (born , died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013