Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Feliciani, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1804Born
182318.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Aug 185045.8AppointedPrefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
20 Jun 185550.7ResignedPrefect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
17 Mar 186661.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Antonio Feliciani
Father Antonio Feliciani O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarano, Italy
Death PlaceTung-erh-kow/Shansi

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast