Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Ricardo Araya

Bishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1960 Born
21 Dec 198424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Río Cuarto, Argentina
2 Aug 201757.3AppointedBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
7 Oct 201757.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Hugo Ricardo Araya
Bishop Hugo Ricardo Araya (born ) Bishop of Cruz del Eje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Cano, Diocese of Río Cuarto
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Cathedral, Cruz del Eje, Diocese of Cruz del Eje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cruz del Eje.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Aug 2017
  • c2+: CB, 14 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 7 Oct 2017