Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Arancedo

Archbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1940 BornBuenos Aires
16 Dec 196727.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 198847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
4 Mar 198847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Selemselae
6 May 198847.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selemselae
19 Nov 199151.1AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
15 Dec 199151.1InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
13 Feb 200362.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina
30 Mar 200362.4InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Arancedo:
Archbishop José María Arancedo (born ) Archbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,808

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 30 Dec 2013