Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Andrea Carlo Cardinal Ferrari

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1850BornLalatta, Pratopiano
15 Dec 187222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Parma, Italy
20 Dec 187323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Parma, Italy
23 Jun 189039.9AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
29 Jun 189039.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
1 Jun 189140.8AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
18 May 189443.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189443.8AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 May 189443.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
2 Feb 192170.5DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 May 1987Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Andrea Carlo Ferrari:
Cardinal Bl. Andrea Carlo Ferrari (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 376, and Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013