Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Giuseppe Lonati, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1886BornBrescia, Italy
6 Aug 191327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Jan 193043.9AppointedPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
10 Jan 193043.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
8 Jun 193044.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
19 Feb 196680.0RetiredPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
29 Sep 197185.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Giuseppe Lonati:
Bishop Emiliano Giuseppe Lonati O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of São José do Grajaú

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013