Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Domenico Sala

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1842BornPorchera
24 Sep 186422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
23 Jan 190360.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
23 Jan 190360.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
15 Feb 190360.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
5 Dec 190361.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Domenico Sala:
Bishop Federico Domenico Sala (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013