Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Pietro Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1856BornSchilpario
21 Dec 187822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
22 Dec 191458.6AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
25 Apr 191559.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
27 Jun 191559.1InstalledBishop of Tortona, Italy
1 Nov 193478.5DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Pietro Grassi:
Bishop Simone Pietro Grassi (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • ob/op/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013