Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Morganti, O.Ss.C.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1852Born
23 Jun 187522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1876²23.0ProfessedPriest of Oblates of Saints Ambrose and Charles
9 Jun 190249.5AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
22 Jun 190249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
14 Nov 190451.9AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
Oct 1908³55.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cervia, Italy
7 Jan 190956.0AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
18 Dec 192169.0DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Morganti (VIAF: 33002698)
Archbishop Pasquale Morganti O.Ss.C.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLesmo, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast