Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Venini

Deceased

Secret Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1889BornFiumelatte di Varenna
6 Jul 191323.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 195161.2AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
12 Jan 195161.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
4 Feb 195161.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
16 Dec 196879.1RetiredSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
20 Jul 198191.7DiedSecret Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Diego Venini:
Archbishop Diego Venini (born , died ) Secret Almoner Emeritus of Papal Charities

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015