Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Caccia Dominioni

Deceased

Priest of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1877BornMilan
23 Sep 189922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Dec 193558.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 193558.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
12 Nov 194669.8DiedPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Caccia Dominioni:
Cardinal Camillo Caccia Dominioni (born , died ) Priest of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013