Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Macchi

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1878Born
6 Jun 190325.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 192244.7AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
21 Jan 192344.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
20 May 192345.2InstalledBishop of Andria, Italy
30 Jun 193052.3AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
1 Aug 194769.4DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Macchi
Bishop Alessandro Macchi (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallarate

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast