Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonida Mapelli

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1862Born
7 Jun 188422.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Oct 190745.7AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
6 Jan 190845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
6 Jun 190846.4InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
23 Feb 191553.1DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonida Mapelli
Bishop Leonida Mapelli (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018