Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop René Osvaldo Rebolledo Salinas

Archbishop of La Serena, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1958 Born
25 Aug 198425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Araucanía, Chile
8 May 200445.6AppointedBishop of Osorno, Chile
19 Jun 200445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osorno, Chile
14 Dec 201355.2AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for René Osvaldo Rebolledo Salinas
Archbishop René Osvaldo Rebolledo Salinas (born ) Archbishop of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCunco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Serena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,612
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast